EP0552571 - Release of intracellular components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.1995 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 03.01.1996 [1996/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dey, Margaret Sigler 7920 Secluded Acres Road Apex, North Carolina 27502 / US | 02 /
Keating, William Edward 500 Woodcroft Parkway No. 18-A, Durham, North Carolina 27713 / US | 03 /
Siddiqi, Salman ul-Haq 15 Glencoe Manor Court Sparks, Maryland 21152 / US | 04 /
Down, James Arthur 101 Charter Oaks Circle Cary, North Carolina 27511 / US | [1993/30] | Representative(s) | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92311874.9 | 31.12.1992 | [1993/30] | Priority number, date | US19920819355 | 09.01.1992 Original published format: US 819355 | [1993/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0552571 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/06, // C12N15/10, C12Q1/68 | [1993/30] | CPC: |
C12N1/06 (EP);
C12Q1/68 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/30] | Title | German: | Freigabe von intrazellularen Komponenten | [1993/30] | English: | Release of intracellular components | [1993/30] | French: | Libération de composés intracellulaires | [1993/30] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 19.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 01.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/01] | 03.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/52] | 03.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0520756 ; | [X]FR1491224 ; | [X]DE3337566 ; | [X]DE1470190 ; | [X]FR2043475 ; | [X]FR580481 ; | [A]US3962466 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 83, no. 83, 4 August 1975, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 38196v, A.R.W. SMITH ET AL. 'DIFFERING EFFECTS OF CETYLTRIMETHYLAMMONIUMBROMIDE AND CETRIMIDE B.P. UPON GROWING CULTURES OF ESCHERICHIA COLI NCIB 8277' page 93 ;column 2 ; | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, no. 19, 6 November 1989, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 170481k, N. BOUJAFAAR ET AL. 'EXTRACTION OF CHROMOSOMAL DNA FROM STAPHYLOCOCCUS AND LISTERIA BY A RAPID ACHROMOPEPTIDASE METHOD' page 374 ;column 2 ; |