EP0494815 - Motor vehicles traffic measuring system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT S.A. 34, Quai du Point du Jour 92109 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | For all designated states REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT S.A. 34, Quai du Point du Jour F-92109 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Challe, Philippe 11, rue François Copernic F-78370 Plaisir / FR | 02 /
Sarignac, Alain 5, Square Lavoisier F-78330 Fontenay le Fleury / FR | 03 /
Barreault, Gérard 16, rue Léon Granier F-69110 Saint-Fog-Les-Lyon / FR | 04 /
Gucher, Pascal 60, rue des Aqueducs F-69005 Lyon / FR | 05 /
Defelix, Gilles 27, rue de la Favorite F-69005 Lyon / FR | [1992/29] | Application number, filing date | 92400027.6 | 07.01.1992 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | FR19910000314 | 11.01.1991 Original published format: FR 9100314 | [1992/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0494815 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0494815 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/04, G08G1/052 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
G08G1/04 (EP);
G08G1/052 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1992/29] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugverkehrsmessanlage | [1992/29] | English: | Motor vehicles traffic measuring system | [1992/29] | French: | Système de mesure du trafic de véhicules automobiles | [1992/29] | Examination procedure | 06.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 08.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 18.12.1996 | [2003/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0347090 ; | [A]GB1204484 ; | [A]DE3013950 ; | [A]FR2619944 | [A] - JOURNAL A. vol. 21, no. 3, Juillet 1980, ANTWERPEN BE THEUWISSEN ET AL.: 'ANALYSIS OF TRAFFIC FLOW WITH A CCD-CAMERA AND A MICROPROCESSOR' OPERATING PRINCIPLE |