EP0494828 - Safety document [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1996 [1996/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARJO WIGGINS S.A. 117 quai du Président Roosevelt 92442 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | For all designated states ARJO WIGGINS S.A. 117 quai du Président Roosevelt F-92442 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states ARJO WIGGINS S.A. 3, rue du Pont de Lodi F-75006 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1992/29] | For all designated states ARJO WIGGINS S.A. 3 Rue du Pont de Lodi F-75006 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Camus, Michel Le Guillermet F-38850 Charavines / FR | 02 /
Dubois, Sandrine 1 route des Gorges F-38500 Voiron / FR | [1992/29] | Representative(s) | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1992/29] | Daudens, Michèle Société Arjo Wiggins S.A. 117 quai du Président Roosevelt F-92442 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 92400058.1 | 10.01.1992 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | FR19910000311 | 11.01.1991 Original published format: FR 9100311 | [1992/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0494828 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0494828 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/46 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
D21H17/06 (EP);
D21H21/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1992/29] | Title | German: | Sicherheitspapier | [1992/29] | English: | Safety document | [1992/29] | French: | Document de sécurité | [1992/29] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 01.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2365656 ; | [AD]FR2399505 |