EP0499538 - Package for viscous products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S O F A B 15 bis, route Nationale 76470 Le Tréport / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | For all designated states S O F A B 15 bis, route Nationale F-76470 Le Tréport / FR | ||
Former [1992/34] | For all designated states Société Française d'Aérosols et de Bouchage 15 bis route Nationale F-76470 LE TREPORT / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bougamont, Jean-Louis Résidence du Parc F-76260 Eu / FR | 02 /
Behar, Alain 7, Boulevard Faidherbe F-76260 Eu / FR | [1992/34] | Representative(s) | Eudes, Marcel, et al SOFAB, 4, rue Diderot 92156 Suresnes Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Eudes, Marcel, et al SOFAB, 4, rue Diderot F-92156 Suresnes Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1992/34] | Eudes, Marcel Saint-Gobain Recherche 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc F-93304 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92400375.9 | 12.02.1992 | [1992/34] | Priority number, date | FR19910001691 | 13.02.1991 Original published format: FR 9101691 | [1992/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0499538 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0499538 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/00 | [1992/34] | CPC: |
B65D83/0033 (EP);
B05B15/30 (EP,US);
B05B11/0097 (EP);
B05B11/029 (EP);
B05B11/1047 (EP);
B05B11/0027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/34] | Title | German: | Verpackung für pastöse Medien | [1992/34] | English: | Package for viscous products | [1992/34] | French: | Conditionnement de produits semi-consistants | [1992/34] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 19.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 04.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2510071 (NORMOS ANNIE [FR]); | [YD]EP0193054 (PFEIFFER ERICH GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al); | [A]EP0262535 (BRAMLAGE GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP0380183 (SARA LEE DE NV [NL]) |