EP0501870 - New pharmaceutical compositions, particularly for the treatment of functional infections of the large intestines, and process for obtaining them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE CIVILE BIOPROJET 30, rue des Francs Bourgeois F-75003 Paris / FR | [1992/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwartz, Jean-Charles 9 Villa Seiurat F-75014 Paris / FR | 02 /
Lecomte, Jeanne-Marie 30 rue des Francs-Bourgeois F-75003 Paris / FR | [1992/36] | Representative(s) | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1995/34] | Bernasconi, Jean, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1992/36] | Bernasconi, Jean Cabinet Bernasconi et Vigier 13 boulevard des Batignolles F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92400480.7 | 25.02.1992 | [1992/36] | Priority number, date | FR19910002254 | 26.02.1991 Original published format: FR 9102254 | [1992/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0501870 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/265 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
A61K31/265 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/36] | Title | German: | Neue pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen, insbesondere zur Behandlung von funktionellen Affektionen des Dickdarmes, und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1992/36] | English: | New pharmaceutical compositions, particularly for the treatment of functional infections of the large intestines, and process for obtaining them | [1992/36] | French: | Nouvelles compositions pharmaceutiques, notamment pour le traitement des colopathies fonctionnelles et leur procédé d'obtention | [1992/36] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 25.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/17] | 22.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/52] | 07.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0318377 (BIOPROJET SOC CIV [FR]) |