EP0505231 - Hydraulic control for variable amplitude lift mechanism of at least one internal combustion engine valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwab, Luc 17, Avenue de Coutainville F-92700 Colombes / FR | 02 /
Grocq, Philippe 22, Boulevard Kellermann F-75013 Paris / FR | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Beauchamps, Georges, et al Cabinet Weinstein 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | Beauchamps, Georges, et al Cabinet Z.Weinstein 20, avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92400593.7 | 06.03.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | FR19910003335 | 19.03.1991 Original published format: FR 9103335 | [1992/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0505231 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0505231 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F01L31/22, F01L1/26 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
F01L1/267 (EP);
F01L13/0036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1992/39] | Title | German: | Hydraulische Steuervorrichtung für Amplitudenveränderliche Hubmechanismen mit mindestens einen Brennkraftmaschinenventil | [1992/39] | English: | Hydraulic control for variable amplitude lift mechanism of at least one internal combustion engine valve | [1992/39] | French: | Commande hydraulique pour mécanisme de levée à amplitude variable d'au moins une soupape de moteur à combustion interne | [1992/39] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 27.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60243310 ; | [APD]EP0462853 ; | [A]EP0405927 ; | [A]FR2506834 ; | [A]GB2185784 ; | [APD]FR2663078 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 114 (M-473)(2171) 26 Avril 1986 & JP-A-60 243 310 ( SUZUKI JIDOSHA KOGYO K.K. ) 3 Décembre 1985, & JP60243310 A 00000000 |