EP0504028 - Method of supplying dilute hydrofluoric acid and apparatus for use in this method for supplying the acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.01.1996 [1996/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HASHIMOTO CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 3-6, Nishihonmachi 2-chome Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states HASHIMOTO CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 3-6, Nishihonmachi 2-chome Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohmi, Tadahiro 17-301, Komegafukuro 2-chome, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP | 02 /
Miki, Nobuhiro 23-14-521, Tezukayama 1-chome, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Maeno, Matagoro 2-42-6, Komyodai Izumi-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Hirayama, Ryozi 482, Ryonancho 3-cho, Mozu Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92400596.0 | 06.03.1992 | [1992/38] | Priority number, date | JP19910068022 | 06.03.1991 Original published format: JP 6802291 | [1992/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504028 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C01B7/19, B01F1/00, B01D11/04 | [1992/38] | CPC: |
B01D11/0415 (EP,US);
C01B7/191 (EP,US);
C01B7/195 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Liefern von verdünnntem Wasserstoffluorid und dabei anzuwendende Vorrichtung | [1992/38] | English: | Method of supplying dilute hydrofluoric acid and apparatus for use in this method for supplying the acid | [1992/38] | French: | Procédé d'obtention d'acide fluorhydrique dilué et appareil à utiliser à cet effet | [1992/38] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 30.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/05] | 30.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58055307 ; | [X]US3956112 (LEE LESTER T C, et al) | [X] - SYNTHETIC POLYMERIC MEMBRANES (Book without author name), edited by Walter de GRUYTER & Co., BERLIN, DE, 1987, PAGES 411-428: Y. KOBUCHI ET AL.: "APPLICATION OF ION EXCHANGE MEMBRANES TO THE RECOVERY OF ACIDS BY DIFFUSION DIALYSIS AND ELECTRODIALYSIS" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 143 (C-172)22 June 1983 & JP-A-58 055 307 ( TOKUYAMA SODA; OTHERS ) 1 April 1983, & JP58055307 A 19830401 |