EP0561084 - Method and apparatus for compatible encoding of high definition picture signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1998 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1998 [1998/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46 quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46, Quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 9, place des Vosges La Défense 5 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1995/23] | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 9, place des Vosges La Défense 5 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS (S.A.) 9, Place des Vosges La Défense 5 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boie, Werner 15, rue du Ziegelfeld F-67100 Strasbourg / FR | [1993/38] | Representative(s) | Hartnack, Wolfgang, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Hartnack, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Licensing & Intellectual Property, Göttinger Chaussee 76 30453 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1995/23] | Einsel, Robert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1993/38] | Einsel, Robert, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 92400691.9 | 16.03.1992 | [1993/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0561084 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0561084 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/00 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
H04N7/0157 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/46] |
Former [1993/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur kompatiblen Kodierung von hoch aufgelösten Bildsignalen | [1993/38] | English: | Method and apparatus for compatible encoding of high definition picture signals | [1993/38] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour le codage compatible de signaux d'image haute définition | [1993/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | 21.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 27.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.04.1993 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1993 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1993 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1993 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1993 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1993 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1993 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1993 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.1993 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.1993 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.1993 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9111073 ; | [A]EP0348186 ; | [A]WO8705770 | [A] - SIGNAL PROCESSING OF HDTV, II PROCEEDINGS OF THE THIRD INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON HDTV 1 September 1989, TURIN, IT pages 643 - 648 FERNANDO ET AL. 'MOTION COMPENSATED DISPLAY FIELD RATE CONVERSION OF BANDWIDTH COMPRESSED HD-MAC PICTURES' |