EP0505291 - Heat-fixing apparatus for color video printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Ku Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-Ku Seoul / KR | ||
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states GOLDSTAR CO. LTD. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Ku Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huh, Byong Mu 300-11, Dongbuichon-Dong, Wangkung Apt. 4-409 Yongsan-ku SEOUL / KR | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1992/39] | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92400776.8 | 23.03.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | KR19440005891 | 21.03.1991 Original published format: KR 445891 | KR19720006591 | 04.05.1991 Original published format: KR 726591 | KR19730005891 | 07.05.1991 Original published format: KR 735891 | KR19240007691U | 26.12.1991 Original published format: KR 2407691 U | [1992/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0505291 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0505291 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0505291 | Date: | 01.08.1995 | [1995/38] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0505291 | Date: | 22.08.1995 | [1995/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0505291 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
G03F7/0032 (EP,US);
G03G15/2003 (EP,US);
G03G15/2014 (EP,US);
G03G15/2028 (EP,US);
G03G15/2039 (EP,US);
G03G15/2064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/39] | Title | German: | Hitzefixiergerät für einen Videofarbprinter | [1992/39] | English: | Heat-fixing apparatus for color video printer | [1992/39] | French: | Appareil de fixation par chaleur pour un copieur video en couleurs | [1992/39] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 02.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.05.1996 | NL | 01.05.1996 | DE | 02.08.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | NL | 01.05.1996 | |
DE | 02.08.1996 | ||
FR | 27.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/14] | DE | 02.08.1996 | |
FR | 27.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | DE | 02.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0393592 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]US4045165 (NAKAJIMA TAKANOBU, et al); | [AE]US5155534 (KUROTORI TSUNEO [JP], et al); | [AP]US5030540 (SANGYOJI KAZUO [JP], et al) | Examination | WO9007733 | WO9011552 | EP0400634 |