EP0508861 - Cable inlet wit anchoring module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.1995 [1995/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAPRI-CODEC S.A.:Société anonyme dite 24 à 32 rue Ernest Renan F-92707 Colombes Cédex / FR | [1992/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Vienne, Robert 8 bis, rue Laurent Pichat F-75116 Paris / FR | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Bertrand, Didier, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | Bertrand, Didier, et al c/o S.A. FEDIT-LORIOT & AUTRES CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRIELLE 38, Avenue Hoche F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92400907.9 | 01.04.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | FR19910004498 | 12.04.1991 Original published format: FR 9104498 | [1992/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0508861 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/06 | [1992/42] | CPC: |
H02G3/0683 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [1992/42] | Title | German: | Kabeleinführung mit Verankerungsvorrichtung | [1992/42] | English: | Cable inlet wit anchoring module | [1992/42] | French: | Entrée de câble à module d'ancrage | [1992/42] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 12.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 17.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/33] | 17.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2624664 ; | [A]DE8907815U |