EP0512905 - Heterobifunctional antibodies possessing both catalytic and specific antigen binding properties and methods using them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PASTEUR SANOFI DIAGNOSTICS 3 Boulevard Raymond Poincaré 92430 Marnes La Coquette / FR | [1997/44] |
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states PASTEUR SANOFI DIAGNOSTICS 3 Boulevard Raymond Poincaré F-92430 Marnes La Coquette / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Newman, Karel 6959 Tartan Curve Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | 02 /
Schmidt, Jane 430 Saratoga Street South St. Paul, MN 55105 / US | [1992/46] | Representative(s) | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1992/46] | Varady, Peter Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92401242.0 | 30.04.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | US19910694984 | 03.05.1991 Original published format: US 694984 | US19910807130 | 16.12.1991 Original published format: US 807130 | [1992/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0512905 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0512905 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0512905 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/08, C07K16/00, C12P21/00, G01N33/577, C12Q1/30, A61K39/395, G01N33/53 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
C12N9/0002 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/4283 (EP);
C07K16/44 (EP);
C07K16/468 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1992/46] | C12P21/08, C07K15/28, C12P21/00, G01N33/577, C12Q1/30, A61K39/395, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/46] | Title | German: | Heterobifunktionelle Antikörper mit sowohl katalytischen Eigenschaften als auch spezifischen Antigenbindungseigenschaften und Verfahren zu deren Verwendung | [1997/44] | English: | Heterobifunctional antibodies possessing both catalytic and specific antigen binding properties and methods using them | [1992/46] | French: | Anticorps hétérobifonctionnels ayant une propriété catalytique et une propriété de liaison spécifique à l'antigène, ainsi que des méthodes utilisant ces anticorps | [1997/44] |
Former [1992/46] | Heterobifunktionelle Antikörper mit sowohl katalytischen als auch spezifischen Antigenbindungseigenschaften und Verfahren zu deren Verwendung | ||
Former [1992/46] | Anticorps hétérofonctionnels ayant une propriété catalytique et une propriété de liaison spécifique à l'antigène, ainsi que des méthodes utilisant ces anticorps | Examination procedure | 19.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 21.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.1997 | DK | 29.10.1997 | GR | 29.10.1997 | NL | 29.10.1997 | PT | 29.01.1998 | SE | 29.01.1998 | LU | 30.04.1998 | [2003/07] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 29.10.1997 | |
DK | 29.10.1997 | ||
GR | 29.10.1997 | ||
PT | 29.01.1998 | ||
SE | 29.01.1998 | ||
LU | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/37] | AT | 29.10.1997 | |
DK | 29.10.1997 | ||
PT | 29.01.1998 | ||
SE | 29.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 29.10.1997 | |
DK | 29.10.1997 | ||
SE | 29.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/21] | SE | 29.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0404097 (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]); | [XP]WO9114769 (IGEN INC [US]) | [X] - METHODS vol. 2, no. 2, April 1991, ORLANDO FL, US pages 97 - 105 M. WHITLOW ET AL. 'Single-chain Fv proteins and their fusion proteins.' | [XP] - ESSAYS IN BIOCHEMISTRY vol. 26, 1991, LONDON, GB pages 59 - 75 R. O'KENNEDY ET AL. 'Antibody engineering: an overview.' |