EP0521772 - Process for the preparation of boron nitride ceramics and their precursors from hydrazine derivatives and precursors so produced [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4/8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux Hauts-de-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Majoral, Jean-Pierre 23 Rue de Salas F-31520 Ramonville / FR | 02 /
Brodie, Nancy 38 Rue Jeanne Marvig F-31400 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
Caminade, Anne-Marie 9 Domaine de la Chêneraie F-31520 Ramonville / FR | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Rochet, Michel, et al ELF ATOCHEM S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 - Cedex 42 92091 Paris-La-Défense / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Rochet, Michel, et al ELF ATOCHEM S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8 Cours Michelet La Défense 10 - Cedex 42 92091 Paris-La-Défense / FR | ||
Former [1993/01] | Rochet, Michel, et al ELF ATOCHEM S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 - Cedex 42 F-92091 Paris-La-Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 92401857.5 | 30.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | FR19910008222 | 02.07.1991 Original published format: FR 9108222 | [1993/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0521772 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/10, C04B35/58 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
C07F7/10 (EP);
C04B35/58 (KR);
C04B35/583 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Bornitrid Keramiken und ihrer Vorstufen aus Hydrazinderivaten und so hergestellte Vorstufen | [1993/01] | English: | Process for the preparation of boron nitride ceramics and their precursors from hydrazine derivatives and precursors so produced | [1993/01] | French: | Procédé de préparation de céramiques en nitrure de bore et de leurs précurseurs à partir de dérivés de l'hydrazine et les précurseurs ainsi mis en oeuvre | [1993/01] | File destroyed: | 28.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 06.07.1992 | Examination requested [1993/01] | 30.03.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2163761 (TANIGUCHI ISOJI, et al); | [A]US4581468 (PACIOREK KAZIMIERA J L [US], et al); | [A]EP0278734 (ULTRASYSTEMS DEFENSE AND SPACE [US]); | [A]EP0337843 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) |