EP0522943 - Semiconductor device having a heterojunction interface for transporting carriers with improved carrier mobility [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.1997 [1997/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohori, Tatsuya, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | [1993/02] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92401928.4 | 03.07.1992 | [1993/02] | Priority number, date | JP19910162571 | 03.07.1991 Original published format: JP 16257191 | [1993/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0522943 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0522943 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/76, H01L29/10 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
H01L29/1029 (EP,US);
H01L29/772 (KR);
H01L29/7783 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/02] | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelement mit einem Hetero-Übergang für Ladungsträgertransport mit verbesserter Beweglichkeit | [1993/02] | English: | Semiconductor device having a heterojunction interface for transporting carriers with improved carrier mobility | [1993/02] | French: | Dispositif à semiconducteur ayant une interface à hétérojonction pour transporter des charges avec une mobilité accrue | [1993/02] | Examination procedure | 15.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 31.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP1183859 ; | [Y]US4745452 (SOLLNER T C L GERHARD [US]) | [Y] - INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS CONFERENCE SERIES NUMBER 112 CHAPTER 6 September 1990, BRISTOL, PHILADELPHIA, NEW YORK pages 339 - 344; M. TSUCHIYA ET AL: 'Electron mobility in GaAs-AlAs double quantum wells having resonant coupling' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 468 (E-834)23 October 1989 & JP-A-1 183 859 ( SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES ) 21 July 1989, & JP1183859 A 19890721 | [A] - SEC. INT. CONF. "INDIUM PHOSPHIDE AND RELATED MATERIALS" 23 April 1990, DENVER, COLORADO pages 274 - 281; L. AINA ET AL: 'AlInAs/InP MODFET structures grown by OMVPE' | [A] - SEC. INT. CONF. "INDIUM PHOSPHIDE AND RELATED MATERIALS" 23 April 1990, DENVER, COLORADO pages 424 - 427; G.I. NG ET AL: 'Submicron double heterojunction strained InAlAs/InGaAs HEMT's: An experimental study of DC and microwave properties' | [A] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PART2, LETTERS vol. 26, no. 1, January 1987, TOKYO JP pages 59 - 61; Y. NAKATA ET AL: 'Extremely high 2DEG concentration in selectively doped In0.53Ga0.47As/N-In0.52Al0.48As heterostructures grown by MBE' | Examination | - mobility in GaAs-AlAs double quantum wells having resonant coupling' |