EP0522954 - Surface tension vessel with multiple output flow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.1996 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1996 [1996/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE EUROPEENNE DE PROPULSION 24, rue Salomon de Rothschild 92150 Suresnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | For all designated states SOCIETE EUROPEENNE DE PROPULSION 24, rue Salomon de Rothschild F-92150 Suresnes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Canedi, Frédéric 3 rue de l'Hôtel de Ville F-60240 Chaumont en Vexin / FR | [1993/02] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/02] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92401943.3 | 07.07.1992 | [1993/02] | Priority number, date | FR19910008549 | 08.07.1991 Original published format: FR 9108549 | [1993/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0522954 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0522954 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B64G1/42 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
B64G1/402 (EP,US);
B64G1/4021 (EP);
Y10T137/86212 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86348 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1993/02] | Title | German: | Oberflächenspannungsbehälter mit Mehrfachausgangleistungen | [1995/24] | English: | Surface tension vessel with multiple output flow | [1993/02] | French: | Réservoir à tension superficielle, à débits de sortie multiples | [1993/02] |
Former [1993/02] | Überflächenspannungsbehälter mit Mehrfachzugangleistungen | Examination procedure | 17.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 25.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2254494 (RCA CORP [US]); | [A]US4595398 (ORTON GEORGE F [US], et al); | [AD]WO8803499 (MARTIN MARIETTA CORP [US]); | [A]US4901762 (MILLER JR JOHN A [US], et al); | [A]EP0367001 (ERNO RAUMFAHRTTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) |