EP0524069 - Aerodynamic air deflector removably mounted on a windscreen wiper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAUL JOURNEE S.A. 1, Boulevard Charles de Gaulle F-92707 Colombes Cédex / FR | [1993/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Journée, Maurice Le Bois Hédouin F-60240 Reilly / FR | 02 /
Duda, Jean 21 Grande Rue F-60175 Villeneuve-Les-Sablons / FR | [1993/03] | Representative(s) | Lemaire, Marc Valeo Management Services, Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | Lemaire, Marc Valeo Management Services, Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 F-94004 Créteil / FR | ||
Former [1993/03] | Lemaire, Marc Valeo Management Services, Service Propriété Industrielle, "Le Triangle", 15, rue des Rosiers F-93585 Saint-Ouen Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92401994.6 | 09.07.1992 | [1993/03] | Priority number, date | FR19910008976 | 16.07.1991 Original published format: FR 9108976 | [1993/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524069 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524069 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/32 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
B60S1/3806 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1993/03] | Title | German: | Auf einem Wischblatt montierter abnehmbarer Windableiter | [1993/03] | English: | Aerodynamic air deflector removably mounted on a windscreen wiper | [1993/03] | French: | Balai d'essuie-glace du type comportant une lame déflectrice aérodynamique fixée au moyen d'une attache amovible | [1993/03] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/31] | 07.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0403385 ; | [A]DE3740639 ; | [A]DE1949948 ; | [A]US4989290 |