EP0578893 - Aqueous silicone dispersions curable into elastomers in the presence of oxygen and by elimination of water and which may be mixed with organic latexes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.1995 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frances, Jean-Marc 9, Avenue Condorcet F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 02 /
Leising, Frédéric 11, Allée des Fauvettes F-69440 Mornant / FR | 03 /
Reeb, Roland 2, Allée des Pléiades F-77410 Gressy / FR | [1994/03] | Representative(s) | Fabre, Madeleine-France, et al RHODIA SERVICES Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 40 Rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | Fabre, Madeleine-France, et al RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 25 Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92402085.2 | 17.07.1992 | [1994/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0578893 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/07, C08J3/03 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
C08L83/14 (EP);
C08L83/04 (EP);
C08G77/14 (EP);
C08G77/16 (EP);
C08G77/18 (EP);
C08G77/20 (EP);
C08G77/24 (EP);
C08G77/26 (EP);
C08G77/44 (EP);
C08G77/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/03] | Title | German: | Durch Abspaltung von Wasser luftvernetzende, wässrige Polysiloxandispersionen und Mischungen mit organischer Latex | [1994/03] | English: | Aqueous silicone dispersions curable into elastomers in the presence of oxygen and by elimination of water and which may be mixed with organic latexes | [1994/03] | French: | Dispersions aqueuses de silicone reticulant à l'oxygène de l'air en elastomères par élimination de l'eau ces dispersions pouvant être associées avec des latex organiques | [1994/03] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 22.07.1992 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 01.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/30] | 01.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0430827 ; | [A]EP0434574 ; | [A]EP0279373 |