EP0524880 - Process and installation for pulsating combustion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 16.02.2000 [2000/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jouvaud, Dominique 24 rue Cauchy F-75015 Paris / FR | 02 /
Genies, Bernard 53 avenue de Beauséjour F-91440 Bures sur Yvette / FR | [1993/04] | Representative(s) | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'étude et l'exploitation des procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'étude et l'exploitation des procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92402122.3 | 23.07.1992 | [1993/04] | Priority number, date | FR19910009304 | 23.07.1991 Original published format: FR 9109304 | [1993/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0524880 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0524880 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F23C11/04, F23D14/32 | [1993/04] | CPC: |
F23C15/00 (EP,US);
F23D14/32 (EP,US);
F23C2205/10 (EP,US);
F23C2205/20 (EP,US);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage für pulsierende Verbrennung | [1993/04] | English: | Process and installation for pulsating combustion | [1993/04] | French: | Procédé et installation de combustion pulsée | [1993/04] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1992 | Examination requested [1993/04] | 12.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.1997 | DK | 02.01.1997 | GR | 02.01.1997 | PT | 02.04.1997 | CH | 31.07.1997 | LI | 31.07.1997 | LU | 31.07.1997 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/45] | AT | 02.01.1997 | |
DK | 02.01.1997 | ||
PT | 02.04.1997 | ||
CH | 31.07.1997 | ||
LI | 31.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 02.01.1997 | |
DK | 02.01.1997 | ||
PT | 02.04.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 02.01.1997 | |
PT | 02.04.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 02.01.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU1039966 ; | [Y]SU1498724 ; | [A]US3819318 (PEARSON R); | [Y]WO8200047 (BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]); | [Y]US4645448 (OTTO WILLIAM F [US], et al); | [Y]US4699588 (ZINN BEN T [US], et al); | [A]DE4026555 (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]) | [X] - DATABASE WPIL Section Ch, Week 8422, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M24, AN 84-139031 & SU-A-1 039 966 (METALLURG HEAT TECH URALENERGOCHERMET), & SU1039966 A 00000000 | [Y] - DATABASE WPIL Section Ch, Week 9020, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class L01, AN 90-153294 & SU-A-1 498 724 (CORRESP ENG CONS IN), & SU1498724 A 00000000 |