EP0527675 - Neutron detectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/07] | Method for checking the operation of and for stabilizing a neutron detector in a logging sonde and such detector | ||
[1998/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2000 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Schlumberger Limited 277 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10172 / US | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:DE
IT
SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY B.V. Carnegielaan 12 2517 KM Den Haag / NL | For:NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [1993/07] | For:GB
SCHLUMBERGER LIMITED 277 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10172 / US | ||
For:FR
SERVICES PETROLIERS SCHLUMBERGER 42, rue Saint-Dominique F-75007 Paris / FR | |||
For:DE
IT
SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY B.V. Carnegielaan 12 NL-2517 KM Den Haag / NL | |||
For:NL
SCHLUMBERGER HOLDINGS LIMITED P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wraight, Peter 3030 Bonney Briar Drive Missouri City, Texas 77459 / US | [1993/07] | Representative(s) | Hagel, Francis Etudes et Productions Schlumberger A L'ATTENTION DU SERVICE BREVETS 26, rue de la Cavée B.P. 202 92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | [2009/40] |
Former [1998/44] | Hagel, Francis ETUDES ET PRODUCTIONS SCHLUMBERGER Service Brevets B.P. 202 92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1997/36] | Hagel, Francis Intellectual Property Law Department, Schlumberger Riboud Product Centre, 26, rue de la Cavée 92142 Clamart / FR | ||
Former [1994/29] | Stoole, Brian David Schlumberger plc, Patent Department, 1 Kingsway, First Floor London WC2B 6XH / GB | ||
Former [1994/09] | Stoole, Brian David Schlumberger plc, Patent Department, 1 Kingsway, First Floor London WC2B 6XH / GB | ||
Former [1993/07] | Chareyron, Lucien Service Brevets Patent Department Etudes et Productions Schlumberger BP 202 F-92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92402244.5 | 06.08.1992 | [1993/07] | Priority number, date | US19910742778 | 08.08.1991 Original published format: US 742778 | [1993/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0527675 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0527675 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0527675 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01J47/12, G01T1/185, G01V5/10 | [1993/41] | CPC: |
G01T1/40 (EP);
G01T1/185 (EP);
G01V5/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/07] | G01V5/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/07] | Title | German: | Neutronendetektoren | [1998/24] | English: | Neutron detectors | [1998/24] | French: | Détecteurs de neutrons | [1998/24] |
Former [1993/07] | Verfahren zur Prüfung der Betriebsweise und der Stabilisierung eines Neutronendetektors in einer Registriersonde und ein solcher Detektor | ||
Former [1993/07] | Method for checking the operation of and for stabilizing a neutron detector in a logging sonde and such detector | ||
Former [1993/07] | Procédé de contrôle d'opération et de la stabilisation d'un détecteur de neutrons dans une sonde d'enregistrement et un tel détecteur | Examination procedure | 25.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/21] | 30.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/50] | Request for further processing for: | 22.02.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.06.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1596082 ; | [A]US3710166 (PERELMAN S, et al); | [A]DE2805568 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]US4463264 (YOUNG CHARLES A [US], et al); | [A]DE3437104 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) |