EP0532381 - Method and apparatus for certifying messages transmitted by a facsimile device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEMPLUS CARD INTERNATIONAL Avenue du Pic de Bertagne, Parc d'activités de la Plaine de Jouques 13420 Gémenos / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states GEMPLUS CARD INTERNATIONAL Avenue du Pic de Bertagne, Parc d'activités de la Plaine de Jouques F-13420 Gemenos / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monnot, Jérôme, Cabinet BALLOT-SCHMIT 7, rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | 02 /
Sureaud, Jean, Cabinet BALLOT-SCHMIT 7, rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7 Rue Le Sueur 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7, rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92402367.4 | 31.08.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | FR19910011275 | 12.09.1991 Original published format: FR 9111275 | [1993/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0532381 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0532381 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32, H04N1/42 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
H04N1/32133 (EP,US);
H04N1/42 (EP,US);
H04N1/32112 (EP,US);
H04N1/32128 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3204 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3233 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3269 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1993/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Beglaubigen von Nachrichten die durch ein Faksimilegerät übertragen werden | [1993/11] | English: | Method and apparatus for certifying messages transmitted by a facsimile device | [1993/11] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de certification des messages transmis par télécopie | [1993/11] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 29.01.1993 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 16.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1993 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 24.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2131666 ; | [A]JP61046553 ; | [Y]FR2647289 (DASSAULT ELECTRONIQUE [FR]); | [Y]US4941170 (HERBST NOEL M [US]); | [Y]US4960981 (BENTON WILLIAM M [US], et al); | [A]WO8400229 (AHAROUNI SHAOUL) | [Y] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE. no. 302, Juin 1989, HAVANT, GB pages 461 - 462 'A method for prevention of unauthorized duplication of documents' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 368 (E-096)9 Août 1990 & JP-A-2 131 666 ( MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP. ) 21 Mai 1990, & JP2131666 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 206 (P-478)18 Juillet 1986 & JP-A-61 046 553 ( NEC CORP. ) 6 Mars 1986, & JP61046553 A 00000000 |