EP0532417 - Washing device for a windscreen wiper, especially for motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.1995 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES D'ESSUYAGE 11, rue Faraday 78180 Montigny-Le-Bretonneux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES D'ESSUYAGE 11, rue Faraday F-78180 Montigny-Le-Bretonneux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schon, Wilfrid Chabreyras F-63580 St. Etienne/Usson / FR | 02 /
Peyret, Xavier 126A, Boulevard Lafayette F-63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Propriété Industrielle 2 Rue Andrée Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 F-94004 Créteil / FR | ||
Former [1993/11] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services, Service Propriété Industrielle, "Le Triangle", 15, rue des Rosiers F-93585 Saint-Ouen Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92402479.7 | 10.09.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | FR19910011270 | 12.09.1991 Original published format: FR 9111270 | [1993/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0532417 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/34 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
B60S1/3415 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1993/11] | Title | German: | Scheibenwaschanlage für Scheibenwischer, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1993/11] | English: | Washing device for a windscreen wiper, especially for motor vehicle | [1993/11] | French: | Dispositif de lave-glace pour essuie-glace, notamment de véhicule automobile | [1993/11] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 02.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 16.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/30] | 27.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2756991 ; | [A]WO9010561 ; | [A]DE3740639 ; | [A]GB1603589 |