EP0541410 - Communication method and installation for transmitting digital signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.1997 [1997/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATRA COMMUNICATION 50, rue du Président Sadate 29101 Quimper / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states MATRA COMMUNICATION 50, rue du Président Sadate F-29101 Quimper / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Billon, Thierry 35, rue Marius Jacotot F-92800 Puteaux / FR | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92402708.9 | 05.10.1992 | [1993/19] | Priority number, date | FR19910012312 | 07.10.1991 Original published format: FR 9112312 | [1993/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0541410 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0541410 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/43 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
H04L12/43 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/19] | H04L12/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/19] | Title | German: | Kommunikationsverfahren und Einrichtung zur Übertragung digitaler Signale | [1993/19] | English: | Communication method and installation for transmitting digital signals | [1993/19] | French: | Procédé et installation de communication, à transmission de signaux numériques | [1993/19] | Examination procedure | 14.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/28] | 10.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3961139 (BOWMAN ROBERT A, et al) | [A] - IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE. vol. 24, no. 12, Décembre 1986, NEW YORK,US pages 16 - 22 J.BRANDSMA ET AL. 'A fibre optic ring for voice and data' |