EP0537063 - Process for electrophoretically depositing a metal powder for the coating of workpieces by a diffusion treatment and bath therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/15] | Process for electrophoretically depositing a metal powder for the restoration of workpieces and bath therefor | ||
[1995/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCHATA 2 Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75724 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | For all designated states SOCHATA Energy 1, 32, Avenue de l'Europe F-78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bodin, Marie-Josephe, Aliette 16, rue Maurice Bedel F-86100 Chatellerault / FR | [1993/15] | Representative(s) | Berrou, Paul, et al Snecma Moteurs Propriété Intellectuelle, B.P. 81 91003 Evry Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | Berrou, Paul, et al S.N.E.C.M.A. Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 81 F-91003 Evry Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1993/46] | Moinat, François S.N.E.C.M.A. Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 81 F-91003 Evry Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92402728.7 | 07.10.1992 | [1993/15] | Priority number, date | FR19910012409 | 09.10.1991 Original published format: FR 9112409 | [1993/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0537063 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0537063 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C25D13/02 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
C25D13/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum elektrophoretischen Aufbringen eines Metallpulvers zur Beschichtung von Werkstücken durch Wärmediffusionsbehandlung und dazu benutztes Bad | [1995/49] | English: | Process for electrophoretically depositing a metal powder for the coating of workpieces by a diffusion treatment and bath therefor | [1995/49] | French: | Procédé de dépôt électrophorétique de poudre métallique pour rechargememt de pièces par brasage-diffusion et bain utilisé | [1993/15] |
Former [1993/15] | Verfahren zum elektrophoretischen Aufbringen eines Metallpulvers zum Wiederherstellen von Werkstücken durch Diffusionschweissen und dazu benutztes Bad | ||
Former [1993/15] | Process for electrophoretically depositing a metal powder for the restoration of workpieces and bath therefor | Examination procedure | 19.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 08.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3067120 (FRED PEARLSTEIN); | [A]FR2166050 (FORD FRANCE) |