EP0539282 - Improvements to hydraulic anti-vibration mountings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2, rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2 rue Balzac F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouhier, Bernard 2, rue Gérard Philipe F-18100 Vierzon / FR | [1993/17] | Representative(s) | Burbaud, Eric, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/25] | Burbaud, Eric, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1993/17] | Behaghel, Pierre, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84 rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92402863.2 | 20.10.1992 | [1993/17] | Priority number, date | FR19910013023 | 22.10.1991 Original published format: FR 9113023 | [1993/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0539282 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0539282 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/00 | [1993/17] | CPC: |
F16F13/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1993/17] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen an hydraulischen Antischwingungslagern | [1993/17] | English: | Improvements to hydraulic anti-vibration mountings | [1993/17] | French: | Perfectionnements aux supports antivibratoires hydrauliques | [1993/17] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 20.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62224744 ; | [A]JP1035138 ; | [X]FR2587774 ; | [Y]EP0314913 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 83 (M-677)(2930) 16 Mars 1988 & JP-A-62 224 744 ( KINUGAWA RUBBER ) 2 Octobre 1987, & JP62224744 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 217 (M-828)(3565) 22 Mai 1989 & JP-A-1 035 138 ( TOYOTA MOTOR ) 6 Février 1989, & JP1035138 A 00000000 |