EP0545774 - Silica supports modified by grafting polyalkylguanidinium groups, process for their preparation and their use as catalysts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.1997 [1997/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE DES POUDRES ET EXPLOSIFS 12, quai Henri IV F-75181 Paris Cédex 04 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE DES POUDRES ET EXPLOSIFS 12, quai Henri IV F-75181 Paris Cédex 04 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gauthier, Patricia Chemin des Acacias, Cerny F-91590 La Ferte Alais / FR | 02 /
Gros, Philippe 41, rue de la Richelandière F-42000 Saint Etienne / FR | 03 /
Le Perchec, Pierre 99, rue Pierre Corneille F-69003 Lyon / FR | 04 /
Senet, Jean-Pierre 79, rue de la Gare, Herbeauvilliers-Buthiers F-77760 La Chapelle La Reine / FR | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92403160.2 | 24.11.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | FR19910014847 | 29.11.1991 Original published format: FR 9114847 | [1993/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0545774 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0545774 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/02, C07C53/42 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
C07C67/00 (EP,US);
B01J31/0254 (EP,US);
B01J31/0274 (EP,US);
B01J31/0275 (EP,US);
C07C51/363 (EP,US);
B01J21/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/23] | Title | German: | Mit dem Pfropfen von Polyalkylguanidiniumgruppen modifizierte Silikaträger und Verfahren für ihre Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Katalysatoren | [1996/33] | English: | Silica supports modified by grafting polyalkylguanidinium groups, process for their preparation and their use as catalysts | [1993/23] | French: | Supports de silice modifiés par greffage de groupements polyalkylguanidinium, leur procédé d'obtention et application comme catalyseurs | [1993/23] |
Former [1993/23] | Mit dem Propfen von Polyalkylguanidiniumgruppen modifizierte Silikaträger und Verfahren für ihre Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Katalysatoren | Examination procedure | 19.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 21.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0028107 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0168167 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]); | [A]US4613491 (JUNG IL N [KR], et al); | [A]EP0285937 (HUELS TROISDORF [DE]) |