EP0598958 - Modular medical bed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1998 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medicalux 70, rue de Concise 86500 Montmorillon / FR | [1996/29] |
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states Brenot, Claude 36, Chemin de la Cybellerie F-86280 Saint-Benoit / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brenot, Claude 36, Chemin de la Cybellerie 86280 Saint Benoit / FR | [1997/48] |
Former [1997/45] | 01 /
Brenot, Claude 36, Chemin de la Cybellerie 86280 Saint Benot / FR | ||
Former [1994/22] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 92403184.2 | 26.11.1992 | [1994/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0598958 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0598958 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/012, A61G7/002, G01G19/44 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
A61G7/0507 (EP);
A61G7/002 (EP);
A61G7/012 (EP);
A61G7/0509 (EP);
A61G7/0527 (EP);
G01G19/445 (EP);
A61G2210/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/22] | Title | German: | Medizinisches Bett in Modulform | [1994/22] | English: | Modular medical bed | [1994/22] | French: | Lit médicalisé modulaire | [1994/22] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 20.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 06.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/35] | Request for further processing for: | 20.02.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.03.1997 | Decision despatched | 29.03.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 18.04.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 03.09.1997 | IT | 03.09.1997 | NL | 03.09.1997 | SE | 03.12.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [2003/07] | ES | 03.09.1997 | |
IT | 03.09.1997 | ||
NL | 03.09.1997 | ||
SE | 03.12.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | ES | 03.09.1997 | |
IT | 03.09.1997 | ||
SE | 03.12.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 03.09.1997 | |
SE | 03.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | SE | 03.12.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0322994 ; | [A]US4227269 ; | [A]FR2183354 ; | [A]US4807558 ; | [A]DE9202382U ; | [E]FR2676643 |