EP0545785 - Process for sealing an anodic coating obtained from a chromic acid bath [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.1997 [1997/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DASSAULT-AVIATION 9 Rond Point des Champs Elysées F-75008 Paris / FR | For all designated states SOCIETE DE GALVANOPLASTIE INDUSTRIELLE 51 rue Pierre Curie, Z.I. des Gâtines F-78373 Plaisir / FR | [1993/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Robert 17, rue de la Maladrerie F-78490 Mere / FR | 02 /
Bevalot, Jean 77, rue de Paris F-91570 Bievres / FR | 03 /
Brault, Claude 4, allée des Cornouillers F-78540 Vernouillet / FR | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | Colas, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | Colas, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet de Boisse 37, avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92403190.9 | 26.11.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | FR19910014777 | 29.11.1991 Original published format: FR 9114777 | [1993/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0545785 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0545785 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C25D11/18 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
C25D11/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT [1993/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Abdichten einer in einem Chromsäurebad erzeugten Anodisierungsbeschichtung | [1993/23] | English: | Process for sealing an anodic coating obtained from a chromic acid bath | [1993/23] | French: | Procédé de colmatage d'une couche d'anodisation obtenue en bain chromique | [1993/23] | Examination procedure | 15.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 15.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4256547 | [A] - S.WERNICK & R.PINNER 'the surface treatment and finishing of aluminium and its alloys' 1972 , ROBERT DRAPER LTD , GREAT BRITAIN |