EP0545800 - Trapping device for foreign objects in a secondary loop of a steam generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat Cédex 16 92084 Paris-la-Défense / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat Cédex 16 F-92084 Paris-la-Défense / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poussin, Christophe 14, rue Cacheux F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | 02 /
Ayme, Henri 73, route des Fusillés F-92150 Suresnes / FR | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1993/23] | Mongrédien, André c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92403225.3 | 30.11.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | FR19910014900 | 02.12.1991 Original published format: FR 9114900 | [1993/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0545800 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0545800 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F22B1/02 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
F22B1/025 (EP,US);
G21D1/02 (KR);
Y02E30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, LI, NL, SE [1993/23] | Title | German: | Fremdpartikelfilter im Sekundärkreislauf eines Dampferzeugers | [1993/23] | English: | Trapping device for foreign objects in a secondary loop of a steam generator | [1993/23] | French: | Dispositif de piègeage de corps migrants à l'intérieur du circuit secondaire d'un générateur de vapeur | [1993/23] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 06.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 03.07.1996 | GB | 03.07.1996 | NL | 03.07.1996 | DE | 05.10.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 03.07.1996 | |
GB | 03.07.1996 | ||
DE | 05.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | GB | 03.07.1996 | |
DE | 05.10.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1126306 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]US3916844 (CASSELL DON STUART); | [A]EP0183049 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) |