EP0551779 - Mounting plate for low voltage electrical equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [1993/29] | For all designated states TELEMECANIQUE 43-45 Boulevard Franklin Roosevelt F-92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Milliere, Paul 3, impasse des Pommiers F-21490 Varois et Chaignot / FR | 02 /
Verdenne, Serge 7, rue du Potet F-21120 Marcilly sur Tille / FR | [1993/29] | Representative(s) | Carias, Alain, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle 89, boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | Carias, Alain, et al Schneider Electric SA Direction Propriété Industrielle 33 bis, avenue du Maréchal Joffre F-92002 Nanterre Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1993/29] | Carias, Alain Schneider Electric SA Direction Propriété Industrielle 33 bis, avenue du Maréchal Joffre F-92002 Nanterre Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92403504.1 | 21.12.1992 | [1993/29] | Priority number, date | FR19920000522 | 16.01.1992 Original published format: FR 9200522 | [1993/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0551779 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0551779 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/04 | [1993/29] | CPC: |
H02B1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/29] | Title | German: | Montageplatine für elektrische Niederspannungsgeräte | [1993/29] | English: | Mounting plate for low voltage electrical equipment | [1993/29] | French: | Platine de montage pour appareils électriques à basse tension | [1993/29] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/29] | 17.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2064225 ; | [YD]FR2260255 |