EP0551047 - Holding device with removable guide bush [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NACAM Z.I. No 2, Route de Blois F-41100 Vendôme / FR | [1993/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Courgeon, Jean-Claude 17, rue des Quatres Huyes F-41100 Vendôme / FR | [1993/28] | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92403592.6 | 30.12.1992 | [1993/28] | Priority number, date | FR19920000225 | 10.01.1992 Original published format: FR 9200225 | [1993/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0551047 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0551047 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B25B23/10, F16B43/00 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
F16D1/0864 (EP,US);
B62D1/16 (EP,US);
F16B5/025 (EP,US);
F16B2200/99 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/28] | Title | German: | Haltevorrichtung mit entfernbarer Zentrierbüchse | [1993/28] | English: | Holding device with removable guide bush | [1993/28] | French: | Dispositif de fixation à butée-guide axiale escamotable | [1993/28] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 14.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 27.11.1996 | BE | 31.12.1996 | SE | 27.02.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [1997/49] | BE | 31.12.1996 | |
SE | 27.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | SE | 27.02.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2732099 (BEYL JEAN JOSEPH ALFRED); | [A]FR2522572 (LEGRAND SA [FR]); | [A]EP0187498 (HANDYMATE LTD [GB]); | [A]US4719828 (CORSETTI JOHN A [US]) |