EP0512930 - Dispensers consisting of subassemblies of modular dispenser packages, connectable through stacking of same side by side, for the distribution of backed articles in disposable cardboard boxes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.1998 [1998/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rougemont, Jean Villa Bellevue Route du Mont-Thou - 1677 F-69450 Saint-Cyr-au-Mont d'Or / FR | [1992/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/46] | Application number, filing date | 92420140.3 | 28.04.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | FR19910005782 | 06.05.1991 Original published format: FR 9105782 | [1992/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0512930 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A47F1/14, B65D21/02 | [1992/46] | CPC: |
A47B87/0292 (EP);
A47B87/0207 (EP);
B65D21/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU [1993/04] |
Former [1992/46] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verteileinheiten die aus Unterheiteinheiten bestehen von nebeneinander stapelbaren modularen Behältern zur Verteilung von in wegwerfbaren Kartonschachteln verpackten Artikeln | [1992/46] | English: | Dispensers consisting of subassemblies of modular dispenser packages, connectable through stacking of same side by side, for the distribution of backed articles in disposable cardboard boxes | [1992/46] | French: | Distributeurs composés de sous-ensembles de boîtiers distributeurs modulables pouvant s'associer par empilage, côte à côte, permettant de distribuer des produits conditionnés sous boîtes cartonnées jetables | [1992/46] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) MC, NL, PT, SE | 26.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 22.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 02.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/21] | 22.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/21] | Request for further processing for: | 19.02.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 07.03.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.09.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.07.1992 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1992 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1992 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.07.1992 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.07.1994 | 30.04.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.06.1995 | 30.04.1996 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.1996 | 30.04.1997 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4988003 ; | [A]FR954665 ; | [A]EP0277307 ; | [A]US4938359 ; | [A]US3664494 |