EP0542643 - Grinding and/or dispersion aid based on polymers and/or copolymers partially neutralised by magnesium for aqueous suspensions of mineral materials which are convenient for pigmentary applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COATEX S.A. 35, rue Ampère F-69730 Genay / FR | [1993/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egraz, Jean-Bernard Impasse Moulin Carron F-69130 Ecully / FR | 02 /
Mongoin, Jacques 76bis, avenue Lanessan F-69410 Champagne-au-Mont d'Or / FR | 03 /
Ravet, Georges Route Louis Pradel F-69290 Saint-Genis-les-Ollieres / FR | [1993/20] | Application number, filing date | 92420401.9 | 06.11.1992 | [1993/20] | Priority number, date | FR19910014137 | 12.11.1991 Original published format: FR 9114137 | FR19910014140 | 12.11.1991 Original published format: FR 9114140 | [1993/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0542643 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0542643 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C09C3/04, C09C1/02 | [1993/20] | CPC: |
C08K9/08 (EP,US);
C09C1/021 (EP,US);
C09C3/041 (EP,US);
C09D17/004 (EP,US);
C01P2004/51 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, PT, SE [1993/20] | Title | German: | Mahl- und/oder Dispersionshilfsmittel auf Basis von Polymeren und/oder teilweise durch Magnesium neutralisierten Kopolymeren für wässerige Suspensionen von mineralen Materialien, welche sich eignen für pigmentäre Anwendungen | [1993/20] | English: | Grinding and/or dispersion aid based on polymers and/or copolymers partially neutralised by magnesium for aqueous suspensions of mineral materials which are convenient for pigmentary applications | [1993/20] | French: | Agent de broyage et/ou de dispersion à base de polymères et/ou copolymères neutralisés en partie par du magnésium pour suspensions aqueuses de matériaux minéraux en vue d'applications pigmentaires | [1993/20] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 14.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0100947 (COATEX SA [FR]); | [AD]EP0185458 (ALLIED COLLOIDS LTD [GB]); | [AD]EP0127388 (ALLIED COLLOIDS LTD [GB]); | [AD]EP0261039 (COATEX SA [FR]); | [A]EP0380430 (COATEX SA [FR]) |