EP0549499 - Means for producing floors or other sandwich panels and elements used for their construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poincelet, Lucien 3, place Pierre Vauboin 69160 Tassin-la-Demi-Lune / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states Poincelet, Lucien 3, place Pierre Vauboin F-69160 Tassin-la-Demi-Lune / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/26] | Application number, filing date | 92420485.2 | 28.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | FR19910016438 | 26.12.1991 Original published format: FR 9116438 | [1993/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0549499 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0549499 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B32B3/12, E04C2/34 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
B32B3/12 (EP,US);
E04C2/34 (EP);
B32B2607/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Böden oder verschiedener Sandwichplatten und verwendete Elemente zu deren Herstellung | [1993/26] | English: | Means for producing floors or other sandwich panels and elements used for their construction | [1993/26] | French: | Dispositif pour réaliser des planchers ou autres panneaux du type sandwich et éléments utilisés pour leur construction | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.03.1996 | NL | 27.03.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [1997/03] | AT | 27.03.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]BE498839 ; | [AD]GB601674 (NAUM GABO); | [A]US3876492 (SCHOTT LAWRENCE A); | [AD]US4495237 (PATTERSON FRED R [US]); | [A]EP0230389 (SAVIEZ JOSEPH) | Examination | US4348442 |