EP0550362 - Means for separating highway lanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.02.1996 [1996/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SODIREL S.A. Lot 17 - Z.I. F-84100 Orange / FR | For all designated states SANEF - SOCIETE DES AUTOROUTES DU NORD ET DE L'EST DE LA FRANCE 41bis, Avenue Bosquet F-75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | For all designated states SODIREL S.A. Lot 17 - Z.I. F-84100 Orange / FR | ||
For all designated states SANEF - SOCIETE DES AUTOROUTES DU NORD ET DE L'EST DE LA FRANCE 41bis, Avenue Bosquet F-75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marc, Jean-Luc Quartier du Gourreou F-84420 Mornas / FR | 02 /
Barbry, Jean-Henry 8 rue des Placeaux F-60550 Verneuil en Halatte / FR | [1993/27] | Representative(s) | Moretti, René, et al c/o Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE "Prado-Mermoz" 232, Avenue du Prado 13008 Marseille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | Moretti, René, et al c/o Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE "Prado-Mermoz" 232, Avenue du Prado F-13008 Marseille / FR | Application number, filing date | 92430036.1 | 23.12.1992 | [1993/27] | Priority number, date | FR19910016503 | 31.12.1991 Original published format: FR 9116503 | [1993/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0550362 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E01F15/00, E01F9/08 | [1993/27] | CPC: |
E01F15/088 (EP);
E01F15/086 (EP);
E01F9/588 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/27] | Title | German: | Mittel für die Trennung von Autobahn-Fahrbahnen | [1993/27] | English: | Means for separating highway lanes | [1993/27] | French: | Dispositif séparateur de voies autoroutières | [1993/27] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 16.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/08] | 22.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1996/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8912142 ; | [A]US4515499 |