EP0533600 - Releasable flexible corner connection for a heddle frame of a loom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETS BURCKLE & CIE S.A. Bourbach-le-Bas F-68290 Masevaux / FR | [1993/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheiwe, Joseph 24, rue des Bleuets F-68440 Habsheim / FR | [1993/12] | Representative(s) | Nithardt, Roland Cabinet Nithardt & Associés S.A. 14 Boulevard Alfred Wallach B.P. 1445 68071 Mulhouse Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Nithardt, Roland Cabinet Nithardt & Associés S.A. 14 Boulevard Alfred Wallach B.P. 1445 68071 Mulhouse Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1993/12] | Nithardt, Roland CABINET NITHARDT & BURKARD 12 rue du 17 Novembre Boite Postale 1445 F-68071 Mulhouse Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92440103.7 | 15.09.1992 | [1993/12] | Priority number, date | FR19910011789 | 20.09.1991 Original published format: FR 9111789 | [1993/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0533600 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0533600 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D03C9/06 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
D03C9/0675 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI [1993/12] | Title | German: | Lösbare flexible Webschaftrahmeneckverbindung für Webmaschinen | [1993/12] | English: | Releasable flexible corner connection for a heddle frame of a loom | [1993/12] | French: | Jonction élastique démontable dans un angle d'un cadre de lisse pour machine à tisser | [1993/12] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 24.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 15.02.1995 | [2002/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0303768 ; | [AD]CH671783 ; | [A]US4349052 ; | [A]WO9112360 ; | [A]US5005607 |