EP0550363 - Display and sales package, especially for small articles, and method of manufacturing such a package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buch, Pierre 33, rue du Général Leclerc F-67202 Wolfisheim / FR | [1993/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/27] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1997/12] |
Former [1993/27] | Arbousse-Bastide, Jean-Claude Philippe CABINET ARBOUSSE BASTIDE 20, rue de Copenhague F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 92440139.1 | 04.12.1992 | [1993/27] | Priority number, date | FR19910015197 | 04.12.1991 Original published format: FR 9115197 | [1993/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0550363 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0550363 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/20, B65D5/66, B65D85/02 | [1993/27] | CPC: |
B65D5/2009 (EP,US);
B65D5/6667 (EP,US);
B65D77/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/27] | Title | German: | Verpackung zur Präsentation und zum Verkauf, insbesondere von kleinen Artikeln, sowie Herstellungsverfahren für diese Verpackung | [1993/27] | English: | Display and sales package, especially for small articles, and method of manufacturing such a package | [1993/27] | French: | Emballage de présentation et de vente, notamment de petits articles, et procédé de réalisation d'un tel emballage | [1993/27] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 19.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 14.09.1995 | [1995/46] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.03.1997 | DK | 19.03.1997 | ES | 19.03.1997 | GB | 19.03.1997 | GR | 19.03.1997 | IT | 19.03.1997 | NL | 19.03.1997 | PT | 19.06.1997 | SE | 19.06.1997 | DE | 20.06.1997 | LU | 04.12.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
DK | 19.03.1997 | ||
ES | 19.03.1997 | ||
GB | 19.03.1997 | ||
GR | 19.03.1997 | ||
IT | 19.03.1997 | ||
NL | 19.03.1997 | ||
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
DE | 20.06.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
DK | 19.03.1997 | ||
ES | 19.03.1997 | ||
GB | 19.03.1997 | ||
GR | 19.03.1997 | ||
IT | 19.03.1997 | ||
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
DE | 20.06.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
DK | 19.03.1997 | ||
GB | 19.03.1997 | ||
GR | 19.03.1997 | ||
IT | 19.03.1997 | ||
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
DE | 20.06.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
DK | 19.03.1997 | ||
GB | 19.03.1997 | ||
IT | 19.03.1997 | ||
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
DE | 20.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
DK | 19.03.1997 | ||
GB | 19.03.1997 | ||
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
DE | 20.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
GB | 19.03.1997 | ||
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
DE | 20.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/05] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
GB | 19.03.1997 | ||
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
DE | 20.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
PT | 19.06.1997 | ||
DE | 20.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/43] | AT | 19.03.1997 | |
DE | 20.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 19.03.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2308818 (DAVID LEVKOFF); | [A]US3713577 (SKINNER D); | [A]US4341339 (ZORE FRANK E); | [A]DE9003400U |