EP0509947 - Hypertext marker and method for dynamically displaying help information in an interactive data processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/43] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fishel, Edward Alan 1647 7th Avenue S.E. Rochester, Minnesota 55904 / US | [1992/43] | Representative(s) | de Pena, Alain, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | de Pena, Alain, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1992/43] | Vekemans, André Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 92480049.3 | 27.03.1992 | [1992/43] | Priority number, date | US19910687261 | 18.04.1991 Original published format: US 687261 | [1992/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0509947 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0509947 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/419, G06F9/44 | [1993/48] | CPC: |
G06F9/453 (EP,US);
G06F16/94 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/43] | G06F15/419 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/43] | Title | German: | Hypertextmarkierungen und Verfahren, um Hilfsinformationen in einem interaktiven Datenverarbeitungssystem dynamisch anzuzeigen | [1992/43] | English: | Hypertext marker and method for dynamically displaying help information in an interactive data processing system | [1992/43] | French: | Marqueur hypertexte et procédé pour afficher des informations d'aide dynamiquement dans un système de traitement de données interactif | [1992/43] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 01.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/13] | 29.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0317479 (IBM [US]) | [YD] - COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ACM vol. 33, no. 3, March 1990, pages 296 - 310 J. NIELSEN 'The Art of Navigating through Hypertext' |