EP0539315 - Disposable sheath for a dental optical-fiber lighting-system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sastre Montalvo, Alberto Roble 64 Cartagena (Murcia) / ES | [1993/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/17] | Representative(s) | Garcia Cabrerizo, Francisco OFICINA GARCIA CABRERIZO S.L. Vitruvio 23 28006 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Garcia Cabrerizo, Francisco OFICINA GARCIA CABRERIZO S.L. Vitruvio 23 E-28006 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 92500134.9 | 20.10.1992 | [1993/17] | Priority number, date | ES19910003132 | 21.10.1991 Original published format: ES 9103132 | [1993/17] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0539315 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0539315 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61C19/00, A61C1/16, A61B19/08 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
A61B46/10 (EP);
A61C1/16 (EP);
A61C19/004 (EP);
A61B2017/00907 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/17] | A61C19/00, A61C1/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/17] | Title | German: | Hülle zum einmaligen Gebrauch für zahnärztliche Beleuchtungseinrichtungen mit optischen Fasen | [1993/17] | English: | Disposable sheath for a dental optical-fiber lighting-system | [1993/17] | French: | Gain à usage unique pour un système d'éclairage dental à fibres optiques | [1993/17] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 22.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 02.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/45] | 10.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE8707202U ; | [A]DE2846471 ; | [Y]EP0437004 ; | [A]US3698791 ; | [A]US4907968 |