EP0521810 - A mobile extractor hood with a concertina type collector pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] | 22.11.1993 | Change - priority | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saez Utiel, Antonio 25 de Abril, 5-2a E-46018 Valencia / ES | [1993/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Sanz-Bermell Martinez, Alejandro C/Játiva, 4 46002 Valencia / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Sanz-Bermell Martinez, Alejandro Játiva, 4 E-46002 Valencia / ES | Application number, filing date | 92560001.7 | 11.06.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | deleted | [1994/02] |
Former [1993/01] | deleted | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0521810 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0521810 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F24C1/00, F24C15/20 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
F24C15/2085 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/01] | F24C1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/01] | Title | German: | Mobile Absaughaube mit akkordeonförmig gefalteter Sammelröhre | [1993/01] | English: | A mobile extractor hood with a concertina type collector pipe | [1993/01] | French: | Hotte d'évacuation mobile à tube collecteur du type accordéon | [1993/01] | File destroyed: | 28.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 21.01.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 16.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 17.11.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE9101894U ; | [Y]US4612909 ; | [A]DE8530783U |