EP0542665 - Automatic chiller plant balancing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.1996 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Tower 6304 Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Tower 6304 Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
James, Paul Warren 48 Cobblestone Way Windsor, Connecticut 06095 / US | 02 /
Lewis, Merrill Arthur 1108 Sidney Street Syracuse, New York 13219 / US | [1993/20] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 92630095.5 | 05.11.1992 | [1993/20] | Priority number, date | US19910790859 | 12.11.1991 Original published format: US 790859 | [1993/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0542665 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0542665 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F25B49/02 | [1993/20] | CPC: |
F25B49/022 (EP,US);
F25B2400/075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1993/20] | Title | German: | Automatischer Leistungsausgleich einer Kühlanlage | [1996/05] | English: | Automatic chiller plant balancing | [1993/20] | French: | Equilibrage automatique d'une installation de refroidissement | [1996/05] |
Former [1993/20] | Automatisches Ausgleichsverfahren für eine Kühleranlage | ||
Former [1993/20] | Procédé automatique d'équilibrage pour une installation de refroidissement | Examination procedure | 20.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 09.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4483152 (BITONDO JAMES M [US]); | [A]EP0157723 (CARRIER CORP [US]); | [A]US4646530 (HUENNIGER EDWARD A [US]) |