EP0538181 - A sliding door arrangement for a shower or bath cubicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.1996 [1996/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.I. FLAIR LIMITED Bailieborough Co. Cavan / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | For all designated states M.I. FLAIR LIMITED Bailieborough, Co. Cavan / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corrie, James Graham "Katima" Bailieborough, Co. Cavan / IE | [1993/16] | Representative(s) | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Tomkins & Co., 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 92650006.7 | 14.10.1992 | [1993/16] | Priority number, date | IE19910003549 | 15.10.1991 Original published format: IE 354991 | [1993/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0538181 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/22 | [1993/16] | CPC: |
A47K3/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/16] | Title | German: | Schiebetüranordnung für Dusch- oder Badekabine | [1993/16] | English: | A sliding door arrangement for a shower or bath cubicle | [1993/16] | French: | Agencement de porte coulissante pour cabine de douche ou de bain | [1993/16] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 19.10.1993 | Examination requested [1994/01] | 24.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/25] | 23.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE8509994U ; | [Y]DE3427911 ; | [A]FR2334331 ; | [A]DE3417044 ; | [A]DE8915301U |