EP0496697 - Pallet for rims of automobile tyres or similar disklike objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.07.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alusuisse - Lonza Holding AG Feldeggstr. 4 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | For all designated states Alusuisse - Lonza Holding AG Feldeggstr. 4 CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kemen, Hans-Jörgen Krähenburgstrasse 18 W-7700 Singen / DE | 02 /
Graf, Werner Schwedenstrasse 8 W-7707 Engen / DE | [1992/31] | Application number, filing date | 92810011.4 | 07.01.1992 | [1992/31] | Priority number, date | DE19910000744U | 23.01.1991 Original published format: DE 9100744 U | [1992/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0496697 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65G49/00, B65D19/28 | [1992/31] | CPC: |
B65D19/38 (EP);
B65D2519/00024 (EP);
B65D2519/00059 (EP);
B65D2519/00094 (EP);
B65D2519/00273 (EP);
B65D2519/00278 (EP);
B65D2519/00293 (EP);
B65D2519/00323 (EP);
B65D2519/00333 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/31] | Title | German: | Palette für Felgen von Autoreifen od.dgl. scheibenartige Organe | [1992/31] | English: | Pallet for rims of automobile tyres or similar disklike objects | [1992/31] | French: | Palette pour jantes de pneus d'autos ou objets similaires en forme de disque | [1992/31] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 10.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 14.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.04.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/38] | 04.05.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2722208 ; | [A]WO8303238 ; | [A]DE2649318 |