EP0497736 - Method for grinding clothing on, for example, a carding or cleaning drum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2008/39] |
Former [1992/32] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Demuth, Robert Maulackerstrasse 17 CH-8309 Nürensdorf / CH | 02 /
Fritzsche, Peter Im Eichbühl 18 CH-8405 Winterthur / CH | 03 /
Soltermann, Roland Wehntalerstrasse 637 CH-8046 Zürich / CH | 04 /
Hohloch, Erich Tösstalstrasse 99 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | 05 /
Sauter, Christian Lächenstrasse 20 CH-8247 Flurlingen / CH | 06 /
Meyer, Urs, Dr. Hohfurristrasse 1 CH-8172 Niederglatt / CH | [1992/32] | Application number, filing date | 92810039.5 | 22.01.1992 | [1992/32] | Priority number, date | CH19910000267 | 29.01.1991 Original published format: CH 26791 | [1992/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0497736 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0497736 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B24B19/18, D01G15/38 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
B24B19/18 (EP,US);
D01G15/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/32] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Schleifen von Garnituren beispielsweise einer Karden- oder Reinigungstrommel | [1992/32] | English: | Method for grinding clothing on, for example, a carding or cleaning drum | [1992/32] | French: | Procédé pour meuler les garnitures sur un tambour de cardage ou tambour de nettoyage par exemple | [1992/32] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/32] | 07.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.04.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1996/01] | FR | 08.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2365924 (WOLTERS PETER FA); | [A]US4984395 (DEMUTH ROBERT [CH]) |