EP0518813 - Apparatus for cooling dust-containing hot gases and process for use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.05.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Management AG Haselstrasse 16 5401 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | For all designated states ABB Management AG Haselstrasse 16 CH-5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [1993/39] | For all designated states ABB KESSELANLAGEN AG Neuwiesenstrasse 15 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states GEBRÜDER SULZER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zürcherstrasse 12 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michel, Roland Berneggstrasse 10a CH-8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1994/52] |
Former [1994/28] | Lück, Gert Sulzer Management AG CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [1994/11] | Hammer, Bruno, Dr. c/o Sulzer Management AG KS/Patente/0007W CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [1993/39] | Hammer, Bruno, Dr. c/o Sulzer Management AG KS/Patente/0007 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 92810373.8 | 19.05.1992 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | CH19910001753 | 12.06.1991 Original published format: CH 175391 | [1992/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0518813 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0518813 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C10K1/04, C10J3/86, F22B1/18, F28G13/00, F28G9/00 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
C10K1/04 (EP,US);
C10J3/86 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1687 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1892 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/51] | Title | German: | Anlage zum Kühlen von heissem, staubbeladenem Gas und Verfahren zum Betrieb der Anlage | [1992/51] | English: | Apparatus for cooling dust-containing hot gases and process for use thereof | [1992/51] | French: | Appareil pour refroidir des gaz chauds contenant des poussières et procédé d'exploitation de l'appareil | [1992/51] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 21.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.1995
05.10.1995
ADMISSIBLE Rheinbraun Aktiengesellschaft Stüttgenweg 2 D-50935 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Koepsell, Helmut Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.1995
05.10.1995
ADMISSIBLE Rheinbraun Aktiengesellschaft Stüttgenweg 2 D-50935 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Koepsell, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Mittelstrasse 7 D-50672 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1995/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.1995
05.10.1995
ADMISSIBLE Rheinbraun Aktiengesellschaft Stüttgenweg 2 D-50935 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Koepsell, Helmut Mittelstrasse 5 D-50672 Köln / DE | 03.11.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.02.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 17.02.1997 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1997/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 28.12.1994 | SE | 28.03.1995 | GR | 31.03.1995 | [2004/51] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 28.12.1994 | |
DK | 28.12.1994 | ||
LI | 28.12.1994 | ||
SE | 28.03.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 28.12.1994 | |
SE | 28.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/42] | SE | 28.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2948201 (DEGUSSA [DE]); | [A]DE3618268 (DIDIER WERKE AG [DE], et al); | [A]EP0366606 (SULZER AG [CH]) |