EP0526394 - Process and apparatus for coating particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1996 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glatt GmbH Bühlmühle 79589 Binzen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states GLATT GMBH Bühlmühle D-79589 Binzen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirschfeld, Peter Fritz Franz Schauinslandstrasse 26B W-7800 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
Weh, Manfred Orchideenweg 5 W-7859 Istein / DE | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Eder, Carl E., et al Braunpat Braun Eder AG Patent - Marken - Rechtsanwälte Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/05] | Eder, Carl E., et al Patentanwaltsbüro EDER AG Lindenhofstrasse 40 CH-4052 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 92810507.1 | 03.07.1992 | [1993/05] | Priority number, date | CH19910002068 | 11.07.1991 Original published format: CH 206891 | [1993/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0526394 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0526394 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0526394 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01J2/00, B01J2/16 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
B01J2/006 (EP,US);
D06P5/00 (KR);
B01J2/14 (EP,US);
B01J2/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1993/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Beschichten von Teilchen | [1993/05] | English: | Process and apparatus for coating particles | [1993/05] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour enrober des particules | [1993/05] | Examination procedure | 26.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/21] | 08.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 15.03.1995 | ES | 15.03.1995 | SE | 15.06.1995 | PT | 16.06.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [1998/15] | DK | 15.03.1995 | |
SE | 15.06.1995 | ||
PT | 16.06.1995 | ||
Former [1998/14] | SE | 15.06.1995 | |
PT | 16.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | SE | 15.06.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3237303 (GLATT GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0244550 (ECOLAB INC [US]); | [Y]FR2628014 (TOTAL FRANCE [FR]) |