EP0530149 - Parasiticide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walter, Harald, Dr. Rufacherstrasse 20 CH-4055 Basel / CH | 02 /
Havenhand, Mark, Dr. Tellstrasse 44 CH-4053 Basel / CH | [1993/09] | Application number, filing date | 92810641.8 | 21.08.1992 | [1993/09] | Priority number, date | CH19910002549 | 30.08.1991 Original published format: CH 254991 | [1993/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0530149 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D333/58, C07D333/62, A01N43/54 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
C07D333/62 (EP);
C07D405/12 (EP,KR);
A01N43/54 (EP);
C07D333/58 (EP);
C07D403/12 (EP);
C07D409/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | Schädlingsbekämpfungsmittel | [1993/09] | English: | Parasiticide | [1993/09] | French: | Parasiticide | [1993/09] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 10.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/12] | 18.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2100663 (ASPRO NICHOLAS LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0130735 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]); | [XP]WO9208704 (DU PONT [US]) |