EP0531256 - Method for preparing glycosides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [1997/14] |
Former [1993/10] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ernst, Beat, Dr. Obere Egg 6 CH-4312 Magden / CH | 02 /
Heneghan, Michael, Dr. 8, Rudyard Road Salford M6 7QN / GB | 03 /
Hafner, Andreas, Dr. Fasanenstrasse 13 CH-4402 Frenkendorf / CH | [1993/10] | Application number, filing date | 92810654.1 | 26.08.1992 | [1993/10] | Priority number, date | CH19910002603 | 04.09.1991 Original published format: CH 260391 | [1993/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531256 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0531256 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/02, C07H15/04, C07H15/20 | [1993/10] | CPC: |
C07H15/04 (EP,US);
C07H15/10 (EP,US);
C07H15/18 (EP,US);
C07H15/203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Glykosiden | [1993/10] | English: | Method for preparing glycosides | [1993/10] | French: | Méthode pour la préparation des glycosides | [1993/10] | Examination procedure | 23.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 12.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3972868 (AVELA EERO SAKARI); | [A]EP0168723 (HOECHST AG [DE]) | [A] - ULLMANNS ENCYKLOP|DIE DER TECHNISCHEN CHEMIE, 4. Auflage, Band 16, 1978, Verlag Chemie GmbH, Seiten 587-607 |