EP0541480 - Label detection for an electronic surveillance system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Actron Entwicklungs AG Lettenstrasse 8 CH-6343 Rotkreuz / CH | [1993/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kind, Burckart Zeltweg 92 CH-8032 Zürich / CH | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Lauer, Joachim, et al Hug Interlizenz AG Nordstrasse 31 8035 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Lauer, Joachim, Dr., et al Hug Interlizenz AG Nordstrasse 31 CH-8035 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 92810789.5 | 15.10.1992 | [1993/19] | Priority number, date | CH19910003185 | 31.10.1991 Original published format: CH 318591 | CH19920001098 | 03.04.1992 Original published format: CH 109892 | CH19920002446 | 04.08.1992 Original published format: CH 244692 | [1993/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0541480 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0541480 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/24 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
G08B13/2414 (EP,US);
G08B13/2471 (EP,US);
G08B13/2477 (EP,US);
G08B13/2488 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/19] | Title | German: | Detektionsvorrichtung für Warendiebstahlsicherungsetiketten | [1993/19] | English: | Label detection for an electronic surveillance system | [1993/19] | French: | Dispositif de détection d'étiquettes de surveillance électronique | [1993/19] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/31] | 13.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 24.07.1996 | ES | 24.07.1996 | GR | 24.07.1996 | IT | 24.07.1996 | NL | 24.07.1996 | AT | 15.10.1996 | PT | 24.10.1996 | SE | 24.10.1996 | BE | 31.10.1996 | LU | 31.10.1996 | IE | 06.03.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [2003/07] | DK | 24.07.1996 | |
ES | 24.07.1996 | ||
GR | 24.07.1996 | ||
IT | 24.07.1996 | ||
NL | 24.07.1996 | ||
AT | 15.10.1996 | ||
PT | 24.10.1996 | ||
SE | 24.10.1996 | ||
BE | 31.10.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
IE | 06.03.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | DK | 24.07.1996 | |
ES | 24.07.1996 | ||
GR | 24.07.1996 | ||
IT | 24.07.1996 | ||
AT | 15.10.1996 | ||
PT | 24.10.1996 | ||
SE | 24.10.1996 | ||
BE | 31.10.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
IE | 06.03.1997 | ||
Former [2002/10] | DK | 24.07.1996 | |
GR | 24.07.1996 | ||
IT | 24.07.1996 | ||
AT | 15.10.1996 | ||
PT | 24.10.1996 | ||
SE | 24.10.1996 | ||
BE | 31.10.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
IE | 06.03.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 24.07.1996 | |
GR | 24.07.1996 | ||
IE | 24.07.1996 | ||
IT | 24.07.1996 | ||
AT | 15.10.1996 | ||
PT | 24.10.1996 | ||
SE | 24.10.1996 | ||
BE | 31.10.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 24.07.1996 | |
IE | 24.07.1996 | ||
IT | 24.07.1996 | ||
AT | 15.10.1996 | ||
PT | 24.10.1996 | ||
SE | 24.10.1996 | ||
BE | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [1999/16] | DK | 24.07.1996 | |
IE | 24.07.1996 | ||
AT | 15.10.1996 | ||
PT | 24.10.1996 | ||
SE | 24.10.1996 | ||
BE | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [1998/41] | DK | 24.07.1996 | |
AT | 15.10.1996 | ||
PT | 24.10.1996 | ||
SE | 24.10.1996 | ||
BE | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 24.07.1996 | |
DK | 24.07.1996 | ||
AT | 15.10.1996 | ||
PT | 24.10.1996 | ||
SE | 24.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/24] | BE | 24.07.1996 | |
PT | 24.10.1996 | ||
SE | 24.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | PT | 24.10.1996 | |
SE | 24.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | SE | 24.10.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4356477 (VANDEBULT JAN); | [A]EP0316963 (KNOGO CORP [US]) |