EP0549529 - Process for dyeing or printing of hydroxyl group-containing fiber materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McMullan, David Harold Kurzelängeweg 9 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | 02 /
Schaulin, Rudolf, Dr. Schäferstrasse 62 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | 03 /
Lauk, Urs, Dr. In der Ey 39 CH-8047 Zürich / CH | [1993/26] | Application number, filing date | 92810992.5 | 11.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | CH19910003815 | 20.12.1991 Original published format: CH 381591 | [1993/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0549529 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0549529 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | D06P3/66, D06P3/62, C09B31/08, C09B31/22, C09B35/039, C09B43/16, C09B45/28, C09B62/04 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
C09B31/22 (EP,US);
C09B31/08 (EP,US);
C09B35/039 (EP,US);
C09B43/16 (EP,US);
C09B45/28 (EP,US);
C09B62/04 (EP,US);
D06P3/62 (EP,US);
D06P3/66 (EP,US);
D06P3/8219 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, PT [1993/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Färben oder Bedrucken von hydroxylgruppenhaltigen Fasermaterialien | [1993/26] | English: | Process for dyeing or printing of hydroxyl group-containing fiber materials | [1993/26] | French: | Procédé de teinture ou d'impression de matériaux fibreux contenant des groupes hydroxyles | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 16.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH135951 (CHEM IND BASEL [CH]); | [A]DE725224 (GEIGY AG J R); | [A]FR1573145 ; | [A]DE2311396 (BASF AG); | [A]EP0011873 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP0044805 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]DE3320972 (SANDOZ AG [DE]); | [A]EP0116513 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]GB2166147 (RICOH KK); | [A]CH671025 (SANDOZ AG); | [A]EP0357560 (SANDOZ AG [CH], et al); | [AP]EP0465420 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 97, no. 14, 4. Oktober 1982, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 111284, 'Disazodyes' | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, no. 16, 16. Oktober 1989, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 136008, INOUE ET AL. 'Water-based copper-containing dye compositions' | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 20, 16. Mai 1983, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 162365, BUJALA ET AL. 'Dyes for cellulose fibres' |