EP0508966 - Toxic gas detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beghelli S.p.A. Via Mozzeghine, 13-15 40050 Monteveglio, Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Beghelli S.p.A. Via Mozzeghine, 13-15 40050 Monteveglio, Bologna / IT | ||
Former [1992/42] | For all designated states BEGHELLI S.R.L. Via Mozzeghine 15 I-40050 Monteveglio, Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beghelli, Gian Pietro Via Borgo No. 4 I-40050 Monteveglio (Bologna) / IT | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Coppi, Cecilia Via Oblach No. 1 40141 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | Coppi, Cecilia Via Oblach No. 1 I-40141 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 92830173.8 | 08.04.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | IT1991BO00109 | 09.04.1991 Original published format: IT BO910109 | [1992/42] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0508966 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0508966 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0508966 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G08B21/00, G08B29/14 | [1994/35] | CPC: |
G08B21/16 (EP);
G08B21/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/42] | G08B21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/42] | Title | German: | Detektoranordnung für giftige Gase | [1992/42] | English: | Toxic gas detection | [1992/42] | French: | Dispositif de détection de gaz toxique | [1992/42] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/17] | 21.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/32] | Request for further processing for: | 02.07.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.07.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4088986 (BOUCHER CHARLES E) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 11 *; | [A]US4219806 (ENEMARK ROBERT B [US]) [A] 2 * abstract * * column 2, line 43 - line 48 *; | [A]EP0039549 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 5, line 19 - line 27 ** page 8, line 8 - line 11 *; | [Y]WO9012315 (NEOTRONICS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * page 10, line 14 - line 21 * * page 11, line 1 - line 5 * * page 12, line 22 - line 27 * |