EP0577906 - Structure preventing a parasitic diode from being switched on in an epitaxial tub of integrated circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | ||
Former [1994/02] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 I-20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Demicheli, Marco Via Dante, 18 I-22070 Binago / IT | 02 /
Gola, Alberto Via Eseguiti, 22 Bis I-27043 Broni / IT | [1994/02] | Representative(s) | Prato, Roberto, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | Prato, Roberto, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 92830338.7 | 30.06.1992 | [1994/02] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0577906 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0577906 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/02 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
H01L27/0248 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/02] | Title | German: | Struktur zur Vermeidung des Durchschaltens einer parasitären Diode, die sich in einer epitaktischen Wanne von integrierten Schaltungen befindet | [1994/02] | English: | Structure preventing a parasitic diode from being switched on in an epitaxial tub of integrated circuits | [1994/02] | French: | Structure évitant la mise à l'état "passant" d'une diode parasite dans une région épitaxiale de circuits intégrés | [1994/02] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 28.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.09.1998 | BE | 23.09.1998 | CH | 23.09.1998 | ES | 23.09.1998 | GR | 23.09.1998 | LI | 23.09.1998 | NL | 23.09.1998 | DK | 23.12.1998 | PT | 23.12.1998 | SE | 23.12.1998 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 23.09.1998 | |
BE | 23.09.1998 | ||
CH | 23.09.1998 | ||
ES | 23.09.1998 | ||
GR | 23.09.1998 | ||
LI | 23.09.1998 | ||
NL | 23.09.1998 | ||
PT | 23.12.1998 | ||
SE | 23.12.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 23.09.1998 | |
BE | 23.09.1998 | ||
CH | 23.09.1998 | ||
ES | 23.09.1998 | ||
GR | 23.09.1998 | ||
LI | 23.09.1998 | ||
PT | 23.12.1998 | ||
SE | 23.12.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 23.09.1998 | |
BE | 23.09.1998 | ||
CH | 23.09.1998 | ||
GR | 23.09.1998 | ||
LI | 23.09.1998 | ||
PT | 23.12.1998 | ||
SE | 23.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 23.09.1998 | |
BE | 23.09.1998 | ||
CH | 23.09.1998 | ||
LI | 23.09.1998 | ||
PT | 23.12.1998 | ||
SE | 23.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 23.09.1998 | |
CH | 23.09.1998 | ||
LI | 23.09.1998 | ||
PT | 23.12.1998 | ||
SE | 23.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | BE | 23.09.1998 | |
CH | 23.09.1998 | ||
LI | 23.09.1998 | ||
PT | 23.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 23.09.1998 | |
CH | 23.09.1998 | ||
LI | 23.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | CH | 23.09.1998 | |
LI | 23.09.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3829709 (MAIGRET R, et al); | [A]EP0284979 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]); | [A]US5051612 (AGIMAN DAN [US]) |